TX SB46 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Higher Education
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Higher Education
Summary
Relating to tuition exemptions at public institutions of higher education for certain students who volunteer for outreach programs.
Title
Relating to tuition exemptions at public institutions of higher education for certain students who volunteer for outreach programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Aging
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS