TX SB46 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confidentiality of certain property tax appraisal photographs.
Title
Relating to the confidentiality of certain property tax appraisal photographs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - House - SB 46Third Reading House (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Springer (Y: 45 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-21 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Springer (Y: 45 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | House | Passed as amended |
2015-05-22 | House | Amended |
2015-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-21 | House | Amendment fails of adoption |
2015-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-18 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2015-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-31 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Filed |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |