TX SB467 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedures of the State Commission on Judicial Conduct.
Title
Relating to the procedures of the State Commission on Judicial Conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1368 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1368 |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-13 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |