TX SB496 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to review and approve capital projects and purchases of real property at public institutions of higher education in this state.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to review and approve capital projects and purchases of real property at public institutions of higher education in this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-08 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2013-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property