TX SB499 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirement that certain participating institutions under the student loan program administered by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board provide loan debt information to students.
Title
Relating to the requirement that certain participating institutions under the student loan program administered by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board provide loan debt information to students.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. John Smithee [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-05-22 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-14 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-05-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
STUDENT LOANS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
STUDENT LOANS