TX SB5 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an increase in the amount of the exemption of residence homesteads from ad valorem taxation by a school district, a reduction in the amount of the limitation on school district ad valorem taxes imposed on the residence homesteads of the elderly or disabled to reflect the increased exemption amount, and the protection of school districts against the resulting loss in local revenue.
Title
Relating to an increase in the amount of the exemption of residence homesteads from ad valorem taxation by a school district, a reduction in the amount of the limitation on school district ad valorem taxes imposed on the residence homesteads of the elderly or disabled to reflect the increased exemption amount, and the protection of school districts against the resulting loss in local revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR71 (Enabling for) 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
HB4352 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB4352 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB5 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00005I.htm |