TX SB500 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to making supplemental appropriations and reductions in appropriations and giving direction, including direction regarding reimbursement, and adjustment authority regarding appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to making supplemental appropriations and reductions in appropriations and giving direction, including direction regarding reimbursement, and adjustment authority regarding appropriations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1950 (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#113 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#112 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#55 (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06 See remarks for effective date
2019-06-06 Signed by the Governor
2019-06-05 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Comptroller
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27SenateSigned in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
2019-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts resolution for tech. correction SCR 67
2019-05-26HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-26HouseSubject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1950
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 2179
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts resolution for tech. correction SCR 67
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 842
2019-05-26SenateRules suspended
2019-05-26SenateCo-author authorized
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-04-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-04-23SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-04-18HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-04-18HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-04-17HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-04-17HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-04-17HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-04-17SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-04-17SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-04-17SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-04-17SenateRead
2019-04-17SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-04-01SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-03-28HouseSubject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
2019-03-28HouseRecord vote RV#113
2019-03-28HousePassed
2019-03-28HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-28HouseRecord vote RV#112
2019-03-28HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2019-03-27HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-03-27HouseAmended 3-Huberty
2019-03-27HouseAmended 2-Morrison
2019-03-27HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Kacal
2019-03-27HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-20HouseRecord vote RV#55
2019-03-20HouseCalendars Committee rule adopted
2019-03-27HousePlaced on Emergency Calendar
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-03-13HouseRead first time
2019-03-13HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-13SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-13SenateRecord vote
2019-03-13SenatePassed
2019-03-13SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-13SenateRecord vote
2019-03-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-13SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-03-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-13SenateAmended
2019-03-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor
2019-03-13SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-13SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Finance
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-02-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-15SenateFiled
2019-01-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB500
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00500I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00500S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00500E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00500H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00500F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ03-13-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB500&RcdVtNo=55&Ch=H&Dt=03/20/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB500&RcdVtNo=112&Ch=H&Dt=03/28/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB500&RcdVtNo=113&Ch=H&Dt=03/28/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB500&RcdVtNo=1950&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=30

Bill Comments

feedback