TX SB502 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring certain institutions of higher education to issue reports on the transferability of credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring certain institutions of higher education to issue reports on the transferability of credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1624 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective immediately
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-24HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24SenateRecord vote
2019-05-24SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-24SenateRead
2019-05-24SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1624
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-21HouseAmended 1-Howard
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-05-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07HousePosting rule suspended
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenatePassed
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-26SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-16SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-29SenateFiled
2019-01-29SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback