TX SB51 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirement and study of insurance coverage for serious emotional disturbance of a child.
Title
Relating to the requirement and study of insurance coverage for serious emotional disturbance of a child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB240 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Health
Health--Children's Insurance
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Health--Children's Insurance
Insurance
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB51 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00051I.htm |