TX SB526 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the allocation to and use by the Parks and Wildlife Department and Texas Historical Commission of certain proceeds from the imposition of state sales and use taxes on sporting goods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the allocation to and use by the Parks and Wildlife Department and Texas Historical Commission of certain proceeds from the imposition of state sales and use taxes on sporting goods.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Finance
2019-02-21SenateRead first time
2019-02-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-30SenateFiled
2019-01-30SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SJR24 (Enabling for) 2019-05-28 - Filed with the Secretary of State
HB1214 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback