TX SB530 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to civil and administrative penalties assessed or imposed for violations of laws protecting drinking water, public water supplies, and bodies of water.
Title
Relating to civil and administrative penalties assessed or imposed for violations of laws protecting drinking water, public water supplies, and bodies of water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1537 (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1537 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2019-04-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1267 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Environmental Regulation