TX SB531 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sources of funding for the Texas emissions reduction plan.
Title
Relating to the sources of funding for the Texas emissions reduction plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1545 (Y: 115 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1545 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-20 | House | Amendment withdrawn 2-Murphy |
2019-05-20 | House | Amended 1-C. Bell |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1043 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Referred to Environmental Regulation
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General