TX SB54 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study regarding the appropriate methods and standards to evaluate certain students participating in regional day school programs for the deaf.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study regarding the appropriate methods and standards to evaluate certain students participating in regional day school programs for the deaf.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1651 (Y: 112 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07 Effective immediately
2019-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1651
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-04-24HouseRead first time
2019-04-17HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateAmended
2019-04-17SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Zaffirini
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-12SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Education
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback