TX SB545 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the evaluation of applications for certain financial assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Title
Relating to the evaluation of applications for certain financial assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2019-05-07 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
SECRETARY OF STATE
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
SECRETARY OF STATE