TX SB548 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to complaints filed with and certain other filings submitted to the Texas Ethics Commission.
Title
Relating to complaints filed with and certain other filings submitted to the Texas Ethics Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1608 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-04-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |