TX SB559 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to patient records regarding maternal death.
Title
Relating to patient records regarding maternal death.
Sponsors
Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Rep. Gina Hinojosa [D] | Rep. Armando Walle [D] | Rep. Robert Guerra [D] |
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1659 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1659 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 1-Walle |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-04-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1255 (Same As) 2019-04-05 - Considered in Calendars
Subjects
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
MEDICAL RECORDS
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Women
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
MEDICAL RECORDS
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Women