TX SB563 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reporting of information about the use of federal money for flood research, planning, and mitigation projects.
Title
Relating to the reporting of information about the use of federal money for flood research, planning, and mitigation projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Rep. William Metcalf [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1614 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1614 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-20 | House | Postponed 5/21/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Electronic Information Systems
FLOODS
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Electronic Information Systems
FLOODS
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General