TX SB574 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a franchise tax credit for entities that establish a grocery store or healthy corner store in a food desert.
Title
Relating to a franchise tax credit for entities that establish a grocery store or healthy corner store in a food desert.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB605 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
FOOD
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
FOOD
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB574 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00574I.htm |