TX SB585 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence, and stalking at public and private postsecondary educational institutions; providing an administrative penalty.
Title
Relating to sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence, and stalking at public and private postsecondary educational institutions; providing an administrative penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1735 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Private Schools
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
SEXUAL HARASSMENT
STALKING
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Private Schools
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
SEXUAL HARASSMENT
STALKING