TX SB6 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to emergency and disaster management, response, and recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to emergency and disaster management, response, and recovery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2019 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-13 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#2019
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-24SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-24HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-24HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-24HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-24SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-24SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-24SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-24SenateRead
2019-05-24SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1608
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-22HouseAmended 1-Morrison
2019-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-03-28HouseRead first time
2019-03-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-20SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-20SenateRecord vote
2019-03-20SenatePassed
2019-03-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-20SenateRecord vote
2019-03-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-03-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20SenateAmended
2019-03-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Lucio
2019-03-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20SenateAmended
2019-03-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst
2019-03-20SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-03-06SenateFiled
2019-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB6
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00006I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00006S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00006E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00006H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00006F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ03-20-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB6&RcdVtNo=1608&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB6&RcdVtNo=2019&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=27

Bill Comments

feedback