TX SB616 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas, the conditional transfer of the driver licensing program to the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles, the abolition of the Texas Private Security Board, the transfer of the motorcycle and off-highway vehicle operator training programs to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation, and the regulation of other programs administered by the Department of Public Safety; imposing an administrative penalty; authorizing and repealing the authorization for fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas, the conditional transfer of the driver licensing program to the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles, the abolition of the Texas Private Security Board, the transfer of the motorcycle and off-highway vehicle operator training programs to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation, and the regulation of other programs administered by the Department of Public Safety; imposing an administrative penalty; authorizing and repealing the authorization for fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1979 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1452 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1443 (Y: 74 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 See remarks for effective date
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1979
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-25SenateRecord vote
2019-05-25SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-24SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-23SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-23SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-17SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1452
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-16HouseAmendment withdrawn 4-Israel
2019-05-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16HouseRecord vote RV#1443
2019-05-16HouseAmendment tabled 3-Calanni
2019-05-16HouseAmended 2-Paddie
2019-05-16HouseAmended 1-Paddie
2019-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-04-17HouseRead first time
2019-04-17HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-16SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenatePassed
2019-04-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateAmended
2019-04-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA7 Johnson
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-04-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA6 Johnson
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-04-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA5 Johnson
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateAmended
2019-04-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA4 Hinojosa
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateAmended
2019-04-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Lucio
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateAmended
2019-04-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Watson
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateAmended
2019-04-16SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Menéndez
2019-04-16SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-16SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-22SenateFiled
2019-02-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1530 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB616
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00616I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00616S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00616E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00616H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00616F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-16-F.PDF#page=37
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-16-F.PDF#page=38
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-16-F.PDF#page=39
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB616&RcdVtNo=1443&Ch=H&Dt=05/16/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB616&RcdVtNo=1452&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB616&RcdVtNo=1979&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=83

Bill Comments

feedback