TX SB619 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the sunset review process and certain governmental entities subject to that process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the sunset review process and certain governmental entities subject to that process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1993 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1453 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1993
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2019-05-23HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-23SenateSenate requests conference committee
2019-05-23SenateSenate refuses to concur
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-17SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1453
2019-05-17HousePassed as amended
2019-05-17HouseAmendment withdrawn 2-Pacheco
2019-05-17HouseAmended 1-Paddie
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-16HouseAmendment withdrawn 3-T. King
2019-05-16HouseAmendment adopted as amended 1-Meyer
2019-05-16HouseAmendment amended 2-Hinojosa
2019-05-16HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Meyer
2019-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-02HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-02HouseRead first time
2019-04-30HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-30SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-30SenateRecord vote
2019-04-30SenatePassed
2019-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-30SenateRecord vote
2019-04-30SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30SenateAmended
2019-04-30SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hall
2019-04-30SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-30SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-10SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-26SenateFiled
2019-02-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1680 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Left pending in committee

Subjects

ANATOMICAL BOARD, STATE OF TEXAS
ANGELINA & NECHES RIVER AUTHORITY
BANDERA COUNTY RIVER AUTHORITY & GROUNDWATER DISTRICT
BRAZOS RIVER AUTHORITY
CANCER PREVENTION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF TEXAS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
DIVISION OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION, TEXAS DEPT. OF INSURANCE
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EXPANDED LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES COUNCIL
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
GUADALUPE-BLANCO RIVER AUTHORITY
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
INJURED EMPLOYEE COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
INVASIVE SPECIES COORDINATING COMMITTEE, TEXAS
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
JUDICIAL CONDUCT, STATE COMMISSION ON
JUVENILE JUSTICE BOARD, TEXAS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Workers' Compensation
LAVACA-NAVIDAD RIVER AUTHORITY
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
LOWER COLORADO RIVER AUTHORITY
LOWER NECHES VALLEY AUTHORITY
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
NUECES RIVER AUTHORITY
PERINATAL ADVISORY COUNCIL
PUBLIC HEALTH FUNDING & POLICY ADVISORY COMMITTEE
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
PUBLIC UTILITY COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
RED RIVER AUTHORITY OF TEXAS
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Police & Firefighters
Retirement Systems--Teachers
SABINE RIVER AUTHORITY OF TEXAS
SAN ANTONIO RIVER AUTHORITY
SAN JACINTO RIVER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
SULPHUR RIVER BASIN AUTHORITY
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Commission Bills
Sunset--Review Procedures
TEXAS A&M FOREST SERVICE
TEXAS CIVIL COMMITMENT OFFICE
TRINITY RIVER AUTHORITY OF TEXAS
UPPER COLORADO RIVER AUTHORITY
UPPER GUADALUPE RIVER AUTHORITY
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS

Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB619
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00619I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00619S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00619E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00619H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00619F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-30-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB619&RcdVtNo=1453&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB619&RcdVtNo=1993&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=33

Bill Comments

feedback