TX SB621 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-26 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-26 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of the regulation of plumbing to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission; requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the transfer of the regulation of plumbing to the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission; requiring an occupational license; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Nichols [R] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Rep. Stan Lambert [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - Motion to reconsider fails RV#2032 (Y: 68 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-26 - House - House refuses to adopt conference comm. rept. RV#1969 (Y: 57 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1388 (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - RV#1376 (Y: 81 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to table fails RV#1375 (Y: 50 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - Motion to reconsider fails RV#2032 (Y: 68 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-26 - House - House refuses to adopt conference comm. rept. RV#1969 (Y: 57 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1388 (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - RV#1376 (Y: 81 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Motion to table fails RV#1375 (Y: 50 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#2032 |
2019-05-26 | House | Motion to reconsider fails |
2019-05-26 | House | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1969 |
2019-05-26 | House | House refuses to adopt conference comm. rept. |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | House | Corrected Conference Committee Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Corrected Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-23 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-22 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-22 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | House | Record vote RV#1388 |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1376 |
2019-05-14 | House | Amended 2-S. Thompson |
2019-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1375 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to table fails 2-S. Thompson |
2019-05-14 | House | Amendment(s) offered 2-S. Thompson |
2019-05-14 | House | Amended 1-Schaefer |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to table fails 1-Schaefer |
2019-05-14 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Schaefer |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA4 Menéndez |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Nichols |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Nichols |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1670 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
PLUMBING ADVISORY BOARD, TEXAS
PLUMBING EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PLUMBERS & PLUMBING
PLUMBING ADVISORY BOARD, TEXAS
PLUMBING EXAMINERS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS