TX SB626 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Guadalupe-Blanco River Authority; following the recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Title
Relating to the Guadalupe-Blanco River Authority; following the recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Robert Nichols [R] |
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#759 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#759 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Kolkhorst |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Birdwell |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4634 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Subjects
Governor
GUADALUPE-BLANCO RIVER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Sunset—Required Reviews
GUADALUPE-BLANCO RIVER AUTHORITY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Sunset—Required Reviews