TX SB628 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to bail proceedings and related duties of a magistrate in a criminal case.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to bail proceedings and related duties of a magistrate in a criminal case.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-03-05SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-04SenateFiled
2019-02-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SJR37 (Enabling for) 2019-04-03 - Co-author authorized
HB1323 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback