TX SB632 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the governing bodies and the consultation policies of local mental health authorities with respect to sheriffs, their representatives, and local law enforcement agencies.
Title
Relating to the composition of the governing bodies and the consultation policies of local mental health authorities with respect to sheriffs, their representatives, and local law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] |
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1562 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1562 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1562 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-20 | House | Amended 1-Price |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-04-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |