TX SB64 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to cybersecurity for information resources.
Title
Relating to cybersecurity for information resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Rep. Dade Phelan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1652 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1652 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1652 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 2-Capriglione |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 1-P. King |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPUTERS & SOFTWARE
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Junior College Districts
Electronic Information Systems
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
Protection of Personal Information
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Teachers
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Junior College Districts
Electronic Information Systems
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
Protection of Personal Information
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Teachers
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--Electric