TX SB649 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to promotion of the use of recyclable materials as feedstock for processing and manufacturing.
Title
Relating to promotion of the use of recyclable materials as feedstock for processing and manufacturing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1075 (Y: 120 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-20 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-07 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1075 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion CSHB 286 |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2019-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB286 (Same As) 2019-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT & TOURISM OFFICE, TEXAS
Environment
Environment--Recycling
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Environment
Environment--Recycling
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON