TX SB652 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures and requirements for the issuance of certificates of obligation.
Title
Relating to procedures and requirements for the issuance of certificates of obligation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
INTERNET
Political Subdivisions
Taxation
Taxation--General
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
INTERNET
Political Subdivisions
Taxation
Taxation--General