TX SB657 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the limitation on increases in the appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem taxation.
Title
Relating to the limitation on increases in the appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR38 (Enabling for) 2019-04-30 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB657 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00657I.htm |