TX SB658 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Signed in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to making permanent the former temporary increases in records archive fees and records management and preservation fees charged by district and county clerks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to making permanent the former temporary increases in records archive fees and records management and preservation fees charged by district and county clerks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Amended RV#765 (Y: 120 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Amended RV#666 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateRead
2019-05-21SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-04-29SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-04-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-26HouseRecord vote RV#765
2019-04-26HousePassed as amended
2019-04-26HouseAmended 1-Clardy
2019-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#666
2019-04-25HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-04-25HouseAmended 1-Clardy
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-25HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 686
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-05SenateFiled
2019-02-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB686 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB658
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00658I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00658S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00658E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00658H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00658F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-11-F1.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB658&RcdVtNo=666&Ch=H&Dt=04/25/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB658&RcdVtNo=765&Ch=H&Dt=04/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=5

Bill Comments

feedback