TX SB66 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the decrease of the rates of the franchise tax under certain circumstances and the expiration of that tax.
Title
Relating to the decrease of the rates of the franchise tax under certain circumstances and the expiration of that tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2759 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB66 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00066I.htm |