TX SB665 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Water & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of coastal counties to adopt certain rules for island parks, beach parks, and public beaches; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of coastal counties to adopt certain rules for island parks, beach parks, and public beaches; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-01SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-06SenateFiled
2019-02-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1628 (Same As) 2019-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback