TX SB68 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a duty for peace officers to intervene and make a report when a peace officer uses excessive force.
Title
Relating to a duty for peace officers to intervene and make a report when a peace officer uses excessive force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Amended RV#1531 (Y: 130 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1531 |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-26 | House | Amended 1-Krause |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-25 | House | Amended 1-Krause |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-22 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2011 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety