TX SB681 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the criteria to determine compensation and conditions of employment of firefighters and police officers of certain political subdivisions.
Title
Relating to the criteria to determine compensation and conditions of employment of firefighters and police officers of certain political subdivisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1861 (Same As) 2019-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Political Subdivisions
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Political Subdivisions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB681 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00681I.htm |