TX SB7 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to flood planning, mitigation, and infrastructure projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to flood planning, mitigation, and infrastructure projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1445 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1444 (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13 See remarks for effective date
2019-06-13 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-22SenateRead
2019-05-22SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-16SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16HouseRecord vote RV#1445
2019-05-16HousePassed
2019-05-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-16HouseRecord vote RV#1444
2019-05-16HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2019-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-16HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-05-16HouseAmendment adopted as amended 1-Phelan
2019-05-16HouseAmendment amended 4-Huberty, Murphy, and Walle
2019-05-16HouseAmendment amended 3-Phelan
2019-05-16HouseAmendment amended 2-Phelan
2019-05-16HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Phelan
2019-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2019-03-28HouseRead first time
2019-03-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-20SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-20SenateRecord vote
2019-03-20SenatePassed
2019-03-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-20SenateRecord vote
2019-03-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-03-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20SenateAmended
2019-03-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Creighton
2019-03-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20SenateAmended
2019-03-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Creighton
2019-03-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20SenateAmended
2019-03-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton
2019-03-20SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-03-06SenateFiled
2019-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HJR4 (Enabling for) 2019-05-28 - Filed with the Secretary of State

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB7
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00007I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00007S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00007E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00007H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00007F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ03-20-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB7&RcdVtNo=1444&Ch=H&Dt=05/16/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB7&RcdVtNo=1445&Ch=H&Dt=05/16/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=93

Bill Comments

feedback