TX SB708 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to collection and use of child safety data for licensed day-care centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to collection and use of child safety data for licensed day-care centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective immediately
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23SenateRecord vote
2019-05-23SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-19SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1508
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1507
2019-05-17HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2019-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-17HouseAmended 2-Button
2019-05-17HouseAmended 1-Raney
2019-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-05-02HouseRead first time
2019-05-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-01SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-01SenateRecord vote
2019-05-01SenatePassed
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRecord vote
2019-05-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-29SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-25SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-25SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-04SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-08SenateFiled
2019-02-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1682 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB708
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00708I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00708S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00708E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00708H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00708F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-01-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB708&RcdVtNo=1507&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB708&RcdVtNo=1508&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=41

Bill Comments

feedback