TX SB709 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . August 31, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . August 31, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the allocation and use of the annual constitutional appropriation to certain agencies and institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the allocation and use of the annual constitutional appropriation to certain agencies and institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1398 (Y: 135 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1398 (Y: 135 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . August 31, 2019 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | House | Record vote RV#1398 |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed |
2019-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1562 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
MIDWESTERN STATE UNIVERSITY
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
STEPHEN F. AUSTIN STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE--FORT BEND
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE--NORTH TEXAS
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
MIDWESTERN STATE UNIVERSITY
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
STEPHEN F. AUSTIN STATE UNIVERSITY
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS SOUTHERN UNIVERSITY
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE SYSTEM
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE--FORT BEND
TEXAS STATE TECHNICAL COLLEGE--NORTH TEXAS
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
TEXAS WOMAN'S UNIVERSITY
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON SYSTEM
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS SYSTEM