TX SB71 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of a statewide telehealth center for sexual assault forensic medical examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of a statewide telehealth center for sexual assault forensic medical examination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1644 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1644
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-08HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-04-08HouseRead first time
2019-04-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenatePassed
2019-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-07SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-02-28SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-02-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-06SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback