TX SB714 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the criminal offense of capital murder.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the criminal offense of capital murder.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1573 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB714 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00714I.htm |