TX SB72 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment and duties of the human trafficking prevention coordinating council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment and duties of the human trafficking prevention coordinating council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#962 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-20 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-08 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-08HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-07SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-06SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-06SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#962
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-03HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-03HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 1232
2019-04-26HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-15HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-04-01HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-01HouseRead first time
2019-03-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-27SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-27SenateRecord vote
2019-03-27SenatePassed
2019-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-27SenateRecord vote
2019-03-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-25SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-07SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-06SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1232 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback