TX SB732 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of the practice of physical therapy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of the practice of physical therapy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-05-13HouseRead first time
2019-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-10SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-10SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateCo-author authorized
2019-05-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-02SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-02SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-08SenateFiled
2019-02-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB29 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Committee report printed and distributed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback