TX SB734 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to electronic voter registration.
Title
Relating to electronic voter registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB361 (Same As) 2019-02-19 - Referred to Elections
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SECRETARY OF STATE
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Electronic Information Systems
INTERNET
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SECRETARY OF STATE
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB734 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00734I.htm |