TX SB746 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain procedures associated with voter approval of municipal annexation.
Title
Relating to certain procedures associated with voter approval of municipal annexation.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1258 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1258 |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-10 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2479 |
2019-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2479 (Same As) 2019-05-10 - Laid on the table subject to call