TX SB748 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to maternal and newborn health care, including the newborn screening preservation account.
Title
Relating to maternal and newborn health care, including the newborn screening preservation account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1538 (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1538 (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1538 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-20 | House | Amended 2-S. Davis |
2019-05-20 | House | Amendment tabled 1-Price |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported favorably as amended |
2019-05-10 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Family
Family--General
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICAID
MIDLAND COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
TELEMEDICINE
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Family
Family--General
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICAID
MIDLAND COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
TELEMEDICINE