TX SB753 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the purchasing from people with disabilities program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to wage requirements for community rehabilitation programs participating in the purchasing from people with disabilities program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#816 (Y: 107 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-02 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-02HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-02SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-01SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-01SenateHouse passage reported
2019-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#816
2019-04-30HousePassed
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-29HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HouseLaid out in lieu of companion CSHB 885
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-23HouseReferred to International Relations & Economic Development
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-20SenateNo action taken in committee
2019-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-11SenateFiled
2019-02-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB885 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback