TX SB781 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of child-care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of child-care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1431 (Y: 123 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1408 (Y: 93 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-02 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-02 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-16SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-16SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16HouseRecord vote RV#1431
2019-05-16HousePassed
2019-05-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-15HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15HouseRecord vote RV#1408
2019-05-15HouseAmendment tabled 1-J.D. Johnson
2019-05-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-16HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-16SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-16SenateRemarks ordered printed
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenatePassed
2019-04-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-01SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-12SenateFiled
2019-02-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1698 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback