TX SB784 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to local school health advisory councils and health education provided by school districts, including requirements regarding human sexuality instruction.
Title
Relating to local school health advisory councils and health education provided by school districts, including requirements regarding human sexuality instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
SEX EDUCATION
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--School Districts
SEX EDUCATION