TX SB792 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the practice of dentistry and the provision of teledentistry dental services.
Title
Relating to the practice of dentistry and the provision of teledentistry dental services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1756 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Subjects
DENTAL EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
DENTAL SERVICES
DENTISTS & DENTISTRY
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
INFORMED CONSENT
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
TELEMEDICINE
DENTAL SERVICES
DENTISTS & DENTISTRY
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
INFORMED CONSENT
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
TELEMEDICINE