TX SB8 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-12)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-12)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to state and regional flood planning.
Title
Relating to state and regional flood planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1715 (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1715 (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-25 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1715 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-22 | House | Amended 1-Larson |
2019-05-22 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-22 | House | Postponed 5/22/19 5:00 PM |
2019-05-22 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-20 | House | Postponed 5/22/19 9:00 AM |
2019-05-20 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-17 | House | Postponed 5/20/19 7:00 AM |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-16 | House | Amended 2-Paddie |
2019-05-16 | House | Amended 1-Kuempel, Murr, and Cyrier |
2019-05-16 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-16 | House | Postponed |
2019-05-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-03-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, DIVISION OF THE DEPT. OF PUBLIC SAFETY
FLOODS
SOIL & WATER CONSERVATION BOARD, TEXAS STATE
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, DIVISION OF THE DEPT. OF PUBLIC SAFETY
FLOODS
SOIL & WATER CONSERVATION BOARD, TEXAS STATE
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General